House | 04/28/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Seth Lewis |