Senate | 04/09/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Education | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |