Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0488
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-019-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|