Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0090
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|