Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|