Senate | 03/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Labor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |