Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Re-assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |