Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0383
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 021-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-016-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|