Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |