Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0096
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|