Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0097
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|