Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0579
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date December 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-015-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Home Rule Note Request is Inapplicable
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Motion Prevailed 069-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|