Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-024-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|