Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0552
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-032-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Postponed - Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|