Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0493
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|