Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Do Pass as Amended Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Senate Special Committee on Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |