Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |