Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 017-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Waive Posting Notice | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |