Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0387
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|