House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|