Senate | 05/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |