Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |