Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |