Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0389
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|