Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|