Senate | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |