Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0232
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-020-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 046-009-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 005-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 005-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|