Senate | 03/31/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |