House | 04/28/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |