Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0236
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|