Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-009-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-028-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 044-007-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|