Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|