House | 04/28/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |