Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0391
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 031-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-021-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
To Subcommittee on Cannabis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|