Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci |