Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0465
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Motion Filed To Reconsider the Vote on Motion Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Hernández
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|