Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Postponed - Executive | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |