Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0243
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee; 023-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|