Senate | 03/30/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |