Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |