Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0110
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Effective Date June 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-033-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Second Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Standard Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 045-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|