Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0899
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-006-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-006-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 048-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|