Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0009
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date June 7, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-025-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|