Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|