Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|