Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|