Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0245
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|