Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|