Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|