Senate | 03/13/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |